Bush, Kevin Leslie (CPSO#: 54306)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Oct 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 1995