Bushby, Barbara Jane (CPSO#: 59486)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: Bobbie, Barbara Jane (used until: 27 Sep 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maple Lodge
Unit 115
54 Ridge Road
P O Box 2018
Deep River ON  K0J 1P0
Phone: (613) 584-3238
Fax: (613) 584-3239
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara Bushby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bushby ( CPSO# 59486 )

Business Address:
Maple Lodge
Unit 115
54 Ridge Road
P O Box 2018
Deep River ON  K0J 1P0
Phone Number: (613) 584-3238

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA JANE BUSHBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUSHBY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1990