Bussieres, Lizanne (CPSO#: 59038)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Sep 2011