Butcher, John Jickling (CPSO#: 11617)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1944

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health Effective: 01 Jan 1947 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1944
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Nov 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994