Butchey, Janki (CPSO#: 50323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Dec 1988

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
68 Birchmount Walk
London ON  N6K-4K5
Phone: (519) 657-2832
Fax: (519) 204-2188
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maurice Butchey and Dr. Janki Butchey Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Butchey ( CPSO# 50323 )
Dr. M. Butchey ( CPSO# 23968 )

Business Address:
1051 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 3X4
Phone Number: (519) 472-2060

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1988
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 1988

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 1988 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Janki Butchey's certificate of registration is restricted to the practice
            of Psychiatry.