Butchey, Joseph Krishnamurti (CPSO#: 64944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7404
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount
Emergency Department
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2550
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborugh Hospital -General
3050 Lawrence Ave. East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 431-8181
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Butchey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Butchey ( CPSO# 64944 )

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2550

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7270

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 738-7080

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Apr 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH KRISHNAMURTI BUTCHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTCHEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993