Butchey, Maurice Rienzi Satyamurthi (CPSO#: 23968)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Apr 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1051 Wonderland Road
London ON  N6K 3X4
Phone: (519) 472-2060
Fax: (519) 471-7299
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maurice Butchey and Dr. Janki Butchey Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Butchey ( CPSO# 50323 )
Dr. M. Butchey ( CPSO# 23968 )

Business Address:
68 Birchmount Walk
London ON  N6K 4K5

Business Address:
1051 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 3X4
Phone Number: (519) 472-2060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 11 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 11 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 11, 2018, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Maurice Rienzi
            Satyamurthi Butchey in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Butchey
            has given to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                     DR. MAURICE RIENZI S. BUTCHEY
                                            ("Dr. Butchey")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Butchey, certificate of registration number 23968, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Butchey, acknowledge that following a public complaint that raised
                  concerns about my standard of practice in my family practice and in
                  particular my medical recordkeeping. I underwent remediation and
                  submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report
                  subsequently received by the College raised concerns about my standard of
                  practice in my family practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Butchey, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Butchey, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for at least six (6) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision"). Clinical Supervision shall cease only upon
                        recommendation from the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval from
                        the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Butchey, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review materials provided by the College and have an initial
                              meeting to discuss practice improvement recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks for at
                              least one (1) month. Thereafter, if the Clinical Supervisor
                              recommends it and the College approves, meetings will take
                              place once every month;
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least ten (10) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (v)   For the initial month, directly observe my practice for a
                              minimum of one half day every two (2) weeks consisting of at
                              least six (6) patient encounters, and review the related
                              patient documentation;
                  
                        (vi)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews or direct
                              observation;
                  
                        (vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (viii)Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (ix)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Butchey, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the reports of the
                        assessor dated June 12, 2017 and September 17, 2017, and concerns
                        that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Butchey, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Butchey, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Butchey, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Butchey, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Butchey, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Butchey, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)"). I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment will focus on those deficiencies
                        that were identified in the previous assessment that led to this
                        Undertaking and may include issues that arose during the period of
                        Clinical Supervision. I acknowledge that the Reassessment may
                        include a chart review, direct observation of my care, interviews
                        with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any
                        other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Butchey, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Butchey, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Butchey, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of
                        the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Butchey, undertake that, following the decision referenced
                        in section (6)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of
                        the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are
                        reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Butchey, hereby consent to the following being included on
                        the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (6)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Butchey, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Butchey, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Butchey, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Butchey, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Butchey, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Butchey, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Butchey, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Butchey, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Butchey, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Butchey, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Butchey, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Butchey, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13) above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Following a public complaint that raised concerns about Dr.
                        Butchey's standard of practice in his family practice and in
                        particular his medical recordkeeping, he  underwent remediation and
                        submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment
                        raised concerns about Dr. Butchey's standard of practice in his
                        family practice. As a result:
                              Dr. Butchey will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least 6 months.
                              College approval is required for the termination of clinical
                              supervision. 
                              
                              Dr. Butchey's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Butchey, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Butchey, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Butchey, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors,
                  Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one
                  another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment; and/or
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 11, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Maurice Rienzi Satyamurthi Butchey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 11, 2018:

Following a public complaint that raised concerns about Dr. Butchey’s standard of practice in his family practice and in particular his medical recordkeeping, he underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment raised concerns about Dr. Butchey’s standard of practice in his family practice. As a result:

Dr. Butchey will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least 6 months. College approval is required for the termination of clinical supervision.

Dr. Butchey’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 20, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:

Update: As of April 11, 2018, Dr. Butchey has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)