Butchey, Robert Satyamurti (CPSO#: 87374)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1653 Richmond Street
London ON  N6G 0V1
Phone: (519) 850-3800
Fax: (519) 850-5099
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Tillsonburg District Hospital
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (519) 842-3611
Fax: (519) 688-1031
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert S. Butchey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Butchey ( CPSO# 87374 )

Business Address:
Tillsonburg Medical Clinic
Department of Family Medicine
154 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Z1
Phone Number: (519) 842-3682

Business Address:
1653 Richmond Street
London ON  N6G 0V1
Phone Number: (519) 850-3800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT SATYAMURTI BUTCHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTCHEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2011