Buteau, Jacques (CPSO#: 65995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4 Beechwood Avenue
Suite 200
Ottawa ON  K1L 8L9
Phone: (613) 741-7174
Fax: (613) 741-0176
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J & C Buteau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Menard-Buteau ( CPSO# 65960 )
Dr. J. Buteau ( CPSO# 65995 )

Business Address:
200 - 4 Beechwood Road
Ottawa ON  K1L 8L9
Phone Number: (613) 741-7174

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUES BUTEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTEAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1992