Butler, Brian Thomas (CPSO#: 26703)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Halton Healthcare Services 3001 Hospital Gate Oakville, ON L6M 0L8
Date Received: 05 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017