Butler, Dorianne Elizabeth (CPSO#: 108023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
186 Talbot Street South
Essex ON  N8M 1B6
Phone: 5199619699
Fax: 5199619599
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

15 Mill St E
Tilbury ON  N0P 2L0
Canada
Phone: 5196823699
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dorianne Butler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Butler ( CPSO# 108023)

Business Address:
186 Talbot Street South
Essex ON  N8M 1B6
Phone Number: (519) 961-9699

Business Address:
15 Mill Street East
Tilbury ON  N0P 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 682-3699

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Aug 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORIANNE ELIZABETH BUTLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2017