Butler, Laura Dianne (CPSO#: 103452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's Family Health Team
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3G2
Phone: 613-533-9303
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queen's Student Wellness Services
LaSalle Building
146 Stuart St.
Kingston ON  K7L 2V8
Canada
Phone: 613-533-2506
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Queen's Student Wellness Services
LaSalle Building
146 Stuart St.
Kingston ON  K7L 2V8
Canada
Phone: 613-533-2506
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA DIANNE BUTLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 05 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2016