Butler, Pieter Ormonde Gordon (CPSO#: 16216)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1948

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1957
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Nov 2007

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: November 15, 2007
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Pieter Ormonde Gordon Butler to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the "College"). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College's Registration Department): 1. I, Dr. Pieter Ormonde Gordon Butler, hereby resign from the College effective November 15, 2007. 2. I undertake that I will not apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 4. I acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees to withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee, as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated December 6, 2006, for disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. 5. I agree that, in the event that the College should become aware that I have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction, the College shall, in its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the prosecution of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated December 6, 2006.