Butler-Jones, David Alexander (CPSO#: 32036)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Nov 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Eglantine Driveway
Ottawa ON  K1A0K9
Phone: (613) 960-4480
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ALEXANDER BUTLER-JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTLER-JONES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2005