Butt, Atif Rasul (CPSO#: 95128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 Canadian Forces Health Services
Centre
PO Box 1000 Station Main
30 Route Ortona Road
Borden ON  L0M 1C0
Phone: (705) 424-1200
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Canada
Phone: (705) 434-5100
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Huronia Urgent Care
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 792-0933
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.R. Butt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Butt ( CPSO# 95128 )

Business Address:
31 Canadian Forces Health Services Centre
PO Box 1000 Station Main
30 Route Ortona Road
Borden ON  L0M 1C0
Phone Number: (705) 424-1200

Business Address:
Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 792-0933

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 434-5100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATIF RASUL BUTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2013