Butt, Debra Ann (CPSO#: 71515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
505 - 3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 284-0767
Fax: (416) 800-2508
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Debra Butt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Butt ( CPSO# 71515 )

Business Address:
Scarborough General Medical Mall
Suite 505
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 439-2662

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBRA ANN BUTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1999