Butt, Donald Frederick (CPSO#: 20707)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 08 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1971 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996