Butt, Shehbaz Ali (CPSO#: 71523)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7074
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shehbaz Butt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 2 2010


Corporation Name: Shehbaz Butt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Butt ( CPSO# 71523 )

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEHBAZ ALI BUTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002