Buttar, Kulwant Kaur (CPSO#: 30939)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University India, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McVeen Medical Clinic
1975 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6P 2Z8
Phone: (905) 794-5300
Fax: 905-794-5350
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. K. Buttar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Buttar ( CPSO# 30939 )

Business Address:
McVeen Medical Clinic
1975 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6P 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 794-5300

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KULWANT KAUR BUTTAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTTAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1979