Butter, Andreana Marie (CPSO#: 72486)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Pediatric Surgery
Children's Hospital
Room B1-188
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8401
Fax: (519) 685-8421
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Butter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Butter ( CPSO# 72486 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Room B1-188
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8401

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 16 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREANA MARIE BUTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2005