Butterfill, Lianne (CPSO#: 104294)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
4 South
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6980 Ext. 6982
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2065 Finch Ave. West Suite 309
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Canada
Phone: 416-507-6442
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIANNE BUTTERFILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTTERFILL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Jan 2017 to 02 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016