Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Button, Cheryl Lynn (CPSO#: 59424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 671-5492
Fax: (705) 671-5458
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cheryl L. Button Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Button ( CPSO# 59424 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERYL LYNN BUTTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1990