Butty, Aurfan Nasif Nasser (CPSO#: 91622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: Nasser, Aurfan Nasif (used until: 23 Jan 2017 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Solders Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne St W
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aurfan Butty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Butty ( CPSO# 91622 )

Business Address:
Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 13 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AURFAN NASIF NASSER BUTTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTTY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2016