Buwan, Hayman Buwaneswaran (CPSO#: 87411)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Nov 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 16 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Healthcare
3276 St Clair Ave E
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Phone: (416) 285-3619
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAYMAN BUWANESWARAN BUWAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BUWAN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BUWAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BUWAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BUWAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BUWAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BUWAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 09 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 10 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 09 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 10 Oct 2009 to 09 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 10 Oct 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2010 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Oct 2015
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2015 to 29 Feb 2016
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2016 to 30 Apr 2016
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jan 2017
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2017