Buzon, Antonio Angeles (CPSO#: 50326)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 18 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Antonio A. Buzon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 27 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 2017