Byard, Roger William (CPSO#: 42748)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Tasmania, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 14 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 1990