Byers, Samuel John (CPSO#: 20953)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001