Bykerk, Vivian Patricia (CPSO#: 50155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: Bijkerk, Vivian Patricia (used until: 09 Apr 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Special Surgery
535 East 70th St
New York, NY 10028
USA
New York City NY  10021
United States
Phone: 2126061000
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
60 Murray St, 2nd Floor
Toronto, ON, Canada
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 02 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVIAN PATRICIA BYKERK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BYKERK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1983