Byrne, Alan John (CPSO#: 32786)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Norwegian

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.J. Byrne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1981
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017