Byrne, Charles Patrick (CPSO#: 53194)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mental Health Commission
Waterloo Exchange
Waterloo Road
Dublin
Dublin D04E5W7
Ireland
Phone: 0035316362400
Fax: 0035316362440

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES PATRICK BYRNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BYRNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 31 Jan 1987
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 06 Nov 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2012