Byrne, Paul (CPSO#: 50328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Nov 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 35
1600 Steeles Avenue West
Concord ON  L4K 4M2
Phone: (905) 669-7578
Fax: (905) 669-8737
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.G. Byrne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Byrne ( CPSO# 50328 )

Business Address:
35 - 1600 Steeles Avenue West
Concord ON  L4K 4M2
Phone Number: (905) 669-7578

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL BYRNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BYRNE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1989