Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Byrne, Rory Christopher (CPSO#: 42537)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1999