Byron, Kevin Gerald (CPSO#: 86748)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chigamik Community Health Centre
Unit 10
845 King Street
Midland ON  L4R 0B7
Phone: (705) 527-4154
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

South Georgian Bay
Community Health Centre
14 Ramblewood Drive, Unit 202
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 0C4
Canada
Phone: 705-422-0900
Fax: 705-422-1078
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Byron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013


Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Byron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Byron ( CPSO# 86748 )

Business Address:
South Georgian Bay Community Health Centre
Suite 202
14 Ramblewood Drive
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 0C4
Phone Number: (705) 422-0900

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Carlisle Medical Centre 1493 Centre Road Carlisle, Ontario L0R 1H0
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN GERALD BYRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BYRON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2014