Byszewski, Anna Maria (CPSO#: 54513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4195
Fax: (613) 761-5334
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Byszewski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Byszewski ( CPSO# 54513 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA MARIA BYSZEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BYSZEWSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1990