Bzonek, Peter (CPSO#: 58099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carlisle Medical Centre
1493 Centre Road
P O Box 311
Carlisle ON  L0R 1H0
Phone: (905) 689-3301
Fax: (905) 689-5772
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Bzonek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bzonek ( CPSO# 58099 )

Business Address:
1493 Centre Road
P.O. Box 311
Carlisle ON  L0R 1H0
Phone Number: (905) 689-3301


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Archie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Archie ( CPSO# 58089 )
Dr. P. Bzonek ( CPSO# 58099 )

Business Address:
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Cleghorn Program
703 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER BZONEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BZONEK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1988