Bzowej, Natalie Helen (CPSO#: 65454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ochsner Medical Center
1514 Jefferson Highway
Brent House
Suite 320
new orleans LA  70121
United States
Phone: (504) 842-5790
Fax: (504) 842-5746

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Louisiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 28 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE HELEN BZOWEJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BZOWEJ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993