Hawkins, Cynthia Elaine (CPSO#: 71318)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Paediatric Laboratory Medicine
Division of Pathology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5938
Fax: (416) 813-5974
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vincent Shin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hawkins ( CPSO# 71318 )
Dr. V. Shin ( CPSO# 72739 )

Business Address:
3276 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Phone Number: (416) 469-6076

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6076

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA ELAINE HAWKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWKINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002