First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Mar 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Aug 2009 |