Cabrera, Anthony Elmer (CPSO#: 62739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
112 Queenston Street
Ground Floor
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z4
Phone: (905) 684-0181
Fax: (905) 684-7579
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2951 Walkers Line
2nd Floor
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Canada
Phone: (905) 684-0181
Fax: (905) 684-7579
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

276 Mud Street
Hamilton ON  L8J 3Z6
Canada
Phone: (905) 684-0181
Fax: (905) 684-7579
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 26 Oct 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY ELMER CABRERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CABRERA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1990