Caccia, Nicolette Camilla (CPSO#: 65323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Dec 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1017 Wilson Ave. Suite 202
Toronto ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone: (416) 438-2727
Fax: (416) 438-2713
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pediatric & Adolescent Gynecology
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-6189
Fax: (416) 813-6192
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 07 Dec 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 07 Dec 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 7, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Nicolette Camilla
            Caccia, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Caccia to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. NICOLETTE CAMILLA CACCIA
                                          ("Dr. Caccia")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Caccia, certificate of registration number 65323, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Caccia, acknowledge that the College investigated a public
                  complaint from a patient about my obstetrics/gynecology practice, bearing
                  File Number 105485.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Caccia, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Caccia, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including individualized instruction in
                        communications satisfactory to the College, with an instructor
                        selected by the College (the "Professional Education").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Caccia, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Caccia, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Caccia, undertake to complete this requirement within six
                        (6) months of the date I sign this Undertaking.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (6)   I, Dr. Caccia, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (7)   I, Dr. Caccia, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (8)   I, Dr. Caccia, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (9)   I, Dr. Caccia, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (10)  I, Dr. Caccia, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (11)  I, Dr. Caccia, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (12)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Caccia, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Caccia, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (12)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College investigated a public complaint about Dr.
                              Caccia's obstetrics and gynecology practice. As a result of
                              the investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Caccia will engage in professional education in
                                    communications with an instructor selected by the
                                    College.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Caccia, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (14)  I, Dr. Caccia, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Caccia, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff,
                  to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (c)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 7, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Nicolette Camilla Caccia to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 7, 2018:

The College investigated a public complaint about Dr. Caccia’s obstetrics and gynecology practice. As a result of the investigation:

-Dr. Caccia will engage in professional education in communications with an instructor selected by the College.