Cacciotti, Chantel Danielle (CPSO#: 107636)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 13 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Paediatric
Haematology/Oncology room 3N27
1280 Main Street
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHANTEL DANIELLE CACCIOTTI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CACCIOTTI is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. CACCIOTTI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CACCIOTTI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CACCIOTTI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CACCIOTTI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CACCIOTTI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 13 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 13 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 12 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 13 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018