Cada, Michaela (CPSO#: 79023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SickKids Hospital
Division of Haematology/Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500 Ext. 207758
Fax: (416) 813-5327
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAELA CADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CADA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2007