Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Cadeddu, Margherita Orsola (CPSO#: 67824)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Room G810
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34990
Fax: (905) 521-6006
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Cadeddu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cadeddu ( CPSO# 67824 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charleton Avenue East
Room G810
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGHERITA ORSOLA CADEDDU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CADEDDU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999