Cader, Shifaya (CPSO#: 79816)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Sinhala, Tamil

Education:University of Peradeniya, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East York Medical Health Centre
Suite 27E
45 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Phone: (416) 696-9836 Ext. 222
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Health Centre
Unit 111
2680 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 4Y4
Canada
Phone: (416) 755-2241
Fax: (416) 755-8413
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 469-6580
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shifaya Cader Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cader ( CPSO# 79816 )

Business Address:
Scarborough Medical Centre
111 - 2680 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 4Y4
Phone Number: (416) 755-2241

Business Address:
East York Medical Health Centre
45 Overlea Boulevard
Suite 27E
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Phone Number: (416) 696-9836

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Aug 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIFAYA CADER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CADER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2007