Cahalan, Alan Denis (CPSO#: 63872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
240 Wharncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 4P2
Phone: (519) 685-3210
Fax: (519) 685-1432
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Cahalan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cahalan ( CPSO# 63872 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
240 Wharncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 4P2
Phone Number: (519) 685-3210

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN DENIS CAHALAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAHALAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1992