Cain, Michael Humphrey (CPSO#: 43071)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Swahili, Tok Pisin

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Heart of Ottawa Health Centre
270 Elgin Street
Ottawa, Ontario
K2P 1M2
Ottawa ON  K2P 1M2
Phone: (613) 230-8885
Fax: (613) 230-3666
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL HUMPHREY CAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1997
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1997