Cain, Patricia Ruth Monica Jeannette (CPSO#: 65657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 11
900 Watters Road
Orleans ON  K4A 0B4
Phone: (613) 830-3837
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA RUTH MONICA JEANNETTE CAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993