Caird, John Dudley Dreaper (CPSO#: 86138)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Feb 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Feb 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 May 2007 to 23 Jul 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2007 to 14 Feb 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Feb 2008