Cairncross, Sarah Whittlesey (CPSO#: 58121)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: Rushforth, Sarah Whittlesey (used until: 06 Nov 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2003