Cairney, Anne Elizabeth Lois (CPSO#: 42820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 May 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8494
Fax: (519) 685-8384
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE ELIZABETH LOIS CAIRNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAIRNEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1986